Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ioan Robu

Archbishop Emeritus of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1944 Born
15 Aug 196823.7Ordained PriestPriest
25 Oct 198439.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania
25 Oct 198439.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Cellae in Proconsulari
8 Dec 198440.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cellae in Proconsulari
14 Mar 199045.3AppointedArchbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania
21 Nov 201975.0RetiredArchbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania

MicroData Summary for Ioan Robu
Archbishop Ioan Robu (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bucarest {Bucureşti}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTêrgul Secuesc

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bucarest {Bucureşti}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 23 Nov 2019

Quantcast