Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aurel Percă

Archbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1951 Born
29 Jun 197927.8Ordained PriestPriest of Iaşi, Romania
29 Sep 199948.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Iaşi, Romania
29 Sep 199948.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Mauriana
8 Dec 199948.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mauriana
21 Nov 201968.2AppointedArchbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania
11 Jan 202068.4InstalledArchbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}, Romania

MicroData Summary for Aurel Percă (VIAF: 89686541)
Archbishop Aurel Percă (born ) Archbishop of Bucarest {Bucureşti}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSăbăoani, Diocese of Iaşi
Ordained PriestSfânta Fecioara Mariă, Regină, Cathedral, Iaşi, Diocese of Iaşi
Ordained BishopSfânta Fecioara Mariă, Regină, Cathedral, Iaşi, Diocese of Iaşi

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bucarest {Bucureşti}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,653
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2019
  • c1: AM, 25 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 26 Jan 2020

Quantcast