Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antal Jakab

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alba Iulia, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1909Born
29 Jun 193425.2Ordained PriestPriest of Alba Iulia, Romania
23 Dec 197162.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Alba Iulia, Romania
23 Dec 197162.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Astigi
13 Feb 197262.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Astigi
2 Apr 198071.0SucceededBishop of Alba Iulia, Romania
14 Mar 199081.0RetiredBishop of Alba Iulia, Romania
5 May 199384.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Alba Iulia, Romania

MicroData Summary for Antal Jakab (VIAF: 86304855)
Bishop Antal Jakab (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alba Iulia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilyénfalva
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceGyulafehérvár, Archdiocese of Alba Iulia
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Gyulafehérvár, Archdiocese of Alba Iulia

  • a priest for 58.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 11 Aug 2019

Quantcast