Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lajos Bálint

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Alba Iulia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jul 1929BornDelnita
28 Apr 195727.8Ordained PriestPriest of Alba Iulia, Romania
9 Jul 198152.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Alba Iulia, Romania
9 Jul 198152.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova
29 Sep 198152.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova
14 Mar 199060.7AppointedBishop of Alba Iulia, Romania
5 Aug 199162.1AppointedArchbishop of Alba Iulia, Romania
29 Nov 199364.4ResignedArchbishop of Alba Iulia, Romania
4 Apr 201080.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Alba Iulia, Romania

MicroData Summary for Lajos Bálint:
Archbishop Lajos Bálint (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Alba Iulia

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122, Number 10,951
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013