Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gergely Kovács

Archbishop of Alba Iulia, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1968 Born
3 Jul 199324.9Ordained PriestPriest of Alba Iulia, Romania
24 Dec 201951.4AppointedArchbishop of Alba Iulia, Romania
22 Feb 202051.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Alba Iulia, Romania

MicroData Summary for Gergely Kovács (VIAF: 311413134)
Archbishop Gergely Kovács (born ) Archbishop of Alba Iulia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTârgu Secuiesc, Contea di Covasna, Archdiocese of Alba Iulia
Ordained PriestSt. Michael's, Cathedral, Alba Iulia, Archdiocese of Alba Iulia
Ordained BishopSt. Michael's, Cathedral, Alba Iulia, Archdiocese of Alba Iulia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Alba Iulia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Dec 2019
  • ob: CB, 8 Jan 2020
  • c2+: CB, 27 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 8 Jul 2020

Quantcast