Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gianfranco Cardinal Ravasi

President of the Pontifical Council for Culture

Cardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro

President of the Pontifical Commission for Sacred Archeology


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1942 BornMerate
28 Jun 196623.7Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
3 Sep 200764.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Villamagna in Proconsulari
3 Sep 200764.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Culture
3 Sep 200764.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for the Cultural Heritage of the Church
3 Sep 200764.9AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Sacred Archeology
29 Sep 200764.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Villamagna in Proconsulari
20 Nov 201068.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
20 Nov 201068.1Elevated to Cardinal
23 Jan 201168.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
30 Jul 201269.8ResignedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for the Cultural Heritage of the Church
28 Feb 201370.4CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Culture
28 Feb 201370.4CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Sacred Archeology
16 Mar 201370.4ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Culture
16 Mar 201370.4ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Commission for Sacred Archeology

MicroData Summary for Gianfranco Ravasi:
Cardinal Gianfranco Ravasi (born ) President of Culture

Please contact the Cardinal through the Pontifical Council for Culture.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Sep 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,525
  • c: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013