Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Miguel Maury Buendía

Apostolic Nuncio to Kazakhstan

Titular Archbishop of Italica

Apostolic Nuncio to Kyrgyzstan

Apostolic Nuncio to Tadjikistan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1955 BornMadrid, Spain
26 Jun 198024.6Ordained PriestPriest of Madrid, Spain
19 May 200852.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Italica
19 May 200852.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Kazakhstan
12 Jun 200852.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Italica
12 Jul 200852.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Kyrgyzstan
12 Jul 200852.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Tadjikistan

MicroData Summary for Miguel Maury Buendía:
Archbishop Miguel Maury Buendía (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Kazakhstan

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Kazakhstan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,760

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 8 Aug 2014