Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luís Mumbiela Sierra

Bishop of Santissima Trinità in Almaty, Kazakhstan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1969 Born
25 Jun 199526.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lleida, Spain
5 Mar 201141.7AppointedBishop of Santissima Trinità in Almaty, Kazakhstan
8 May 201141.9Ordained BishopBishop of Santissima Trinità in Almaty, Kazakhstan

MicroData Summary for José Luís Mumbiela Sierra
Bishop José Luís Mumbiela Sierra (born ) Bishop of Santissima Trinità in Almaty

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonzón, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santissima Trinità in Almaty.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 9 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,055

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast