Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Tomash (Tomasz) Bernard Peta

Archbishop of Maria Santissima in Astana, Kazakhstan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1951 Born
5 Jun 197624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno, Poland
7 Jul 199947.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Astana, Kazakhstan
15 Feb 200149.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Benda
19 Mar 200149.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Benda
17 May 200351.7AppointedArchbishop of Maria Santissima in Astana, Kazakhstan

MicroData Summary for Tomash (Tomasz) Bernard Peta (VIAF: 61145067211366631493)
Archbishop Tomash (Tomasz) Bernard Peta (born ) Archbishop of Maria Santissima in Astana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceInowrocław, Archdiocese of Gniezno, Poland
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Maria Santissima in Astana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,938

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast