Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adelio Dell’Oro

Bishop of Karaganda, Kazakhstan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1948 Born
28 Jun 197223.9Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
7 Dec 201264.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Atyrau, Kazakhstan
7 Dec 201264.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Castulo
2 Mar 201364.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castulo
21 Apr 201364.7InstalledApostolic Administrator of Atyrau, Kazakhstan
31 Jan 201566.5AppointedBishop of Karaganda, Kazakhstan
29 Mar 201566.6InstalledBishop of Karaganda, Kazakhstan
16 May 201566.7ResignedApostolic Administrator of Atyrau, Kazakhstan

MicroData Summary for Adelio Dell’Oro
Bishop Adelio Dell’Oro (born ) Bishop of Karaganda

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained PriestCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Karaganda.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2012
  • ob/c2: CB, 4 Feb 2013
  • c34: CB, 1 Mar 2013
  • c3+: CB, 4 Mar 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,660
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Jan 2015
  • loc: AM, 12 Mar 2018
  • i: AM, 11 Mar 2019
  • i: AM, 13 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 14 Mar 2019

Quantcast