Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Crusco

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Marco Argentano-Scalea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1934Born
16 Jul 196126.9Ordained PriestPriest of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
7 Feb 199156.4AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina-Palmi, Italy
20 Apr 199156.6Ordained BishopBishop of Oppido Mamertina-Palmi, Italy
6 Mar 199964.5AppointedBishop of San Marco Argentano-Scalea, Italy
14 Jan 200772.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
13 May 200772.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of Cassano all’Jonio, Italy
7 Jan 201176.3RetiredBishop of San Marco Argentano-Scalea, Italy
25 Aug 201379.0DiedBishop Emeritus of San Marco Argentano-Scalea, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Crusco (VIAF: 204739433)
Bishop Domenico Crusco (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Marco Argentano-Scalea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrisolia, Diocese of San Marco e Bisignano
Ordained PriestSan Marco Argentano, Cathedral, San Marco, Diocese of San Marco e Bisignano
Ordained BishopSan Marco Argentano, Cathedral, San Marco, Diocese of San Marco Argentano-Scalea
Death PlaceGrisolia, Diocese of San Marco Argentano-Scalea
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, San Marco Argentano, Cathedral, San Marco, Diocese of San Marco Argentano-Scalea

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,445
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,761
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 25 Aug 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 15 Jan 2018