Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pier Luigi Mazzoni

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Gaeta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1932BornDovadola
18 Feb 195825.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Apr 199158.7AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
18 May 199158.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
12 Feb 199764.5AppointedArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy
20 Sep 200775.1RetiredArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy
12 Jul 201279.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Gaeta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pier Luigi Mazzoni:
Archbishop Pier Luigi Mazzoni (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Gaeta

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Sep 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,448
  • d: CB, 12 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013