Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario Oliveri

Bishop Emeritus of Albenga-Imperia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1944 BornCampo Ligure
29 Jun 196824.4Ordained PriestPriest of Acqui, Italy
6 Oct 199046.7AppointedBishop of Albenga-Imperia, Italy
4 Nov 199046.7Ordained BishopBishop of Albenga-Imperia, Italy
25 Nov 199046.8InstalledBishop of Albenga-Imperia, Italy
1 Sep 201672.6ResignedBishop of Albenga-Imperia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mario Oliveri (VIAF: 28389847)
Bishop Mario Oliveri (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Albenga-Imperia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Albenga-Imperia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,290
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 2 Sep 2016