Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Steven Joseph Lopes

Ordinary of The Chair of Saint Peter, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1975 Born
5 Oct 200025.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of San Francisco, California, USA
23 Jun 200126.1Ordained PriestPriest of San Francisco, California, USA
24 Nov 201540.5AppointedOrdinary of The Chair of Saint Peter, USA
2 Feb 201640.7Ordained BishopOrdinary of The Chair of Saint Peter, USA

MicroData Summary for Steven Joseph Lopes
Bishop Steven Joseph Lopes (born ) Ordinary of The Chair of Saint Peter

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFremont, CA

Please contact the Bishop through the Personal Ordinariate of The Chair of Saint Peter.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2015
  • ob: CB, 24 Nov 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,835

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast