Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ambrogio Spreafico

Bishop of Frosinone-Veroli-Ferentino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1950 BornGarbagnate Monastero
12 Apr 197525.0Ordained PriestPriest
197625.7IncardinatedPriest of Palestrina, Italy
15 Nov 198838.6IncardinatedPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
3 Jul 200858.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Frosinone-Veroli-Ferentino, Italy
26 Jul 200858.3Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Frosinone-Veroli-Ferentino, Italy
18 Oct 200858.5SucceededBishop of Frosinone-Veroli-Ferentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio Spreafico:
Bishop Ambrogio Spreafico (born ) Bishop of Frosinone-Veroli-Ferentino

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Frosinone-Veroli-Ferentino.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,936

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014