Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
27 Nov 1967 | Born | ||
6 Nov 2004 | 36.9 | Ordained Priest | Priest of Frosinone-Veroli-Ferentino, Italy |
18 Nov 2023 | 55.9 | Appointed | Archbishop of Foggia-Bovino, Italy |
9 Dec 2023 | 56.0 | Ordained Bishop | Archbishop of Foggia-Bovino, Italy |
Father
Giorgio
Ferretti
(born )
Archbishop-Elect
of Foggia-Bovino
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Genova, Archdiocese of Genova {Genoa} |
Ordained Bishop | San Giovanni in Laterano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome} |
Source(s):
|
![]()
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
![]() |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 23 Nov 2023 |
✠