Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kenneth Donald Steiner

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Portland in Oregon, USA

Titular Bishop of Avensa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1936 Born
19 May 196225.4Ordained PriestPriest of Portland in Oregon, USA
28 Nov 197741.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Portland in Oregon, USA
28 Nov 197741.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Avensa
2 Mar 197841.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Avensa
25 Nov 201175.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Portland in Oregon, USA

MicroData Summary for Kenneth Donald Steiner
Bishop Kenneth Donald Steiner (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Portland in Oregon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDavid City, NE
Ordained BishopCivic Auditorium, Portland, Archdiocese of Portland in Oregon

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Portland in Oregon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,136

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 13 Jun 2020

Quantcast