Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Edward Waldschmidt, C.S.C. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Portland in Oregon

Titular Bishop of Citium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jan 1920BornEvansville
24 Jun 194626.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
28 Nov 197757.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Portland in Oregon, USA
28 Nov 197757.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Citium
2 Mar 197858.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Citium
8 Jan 199070.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Portland in Oregon, USA
20 Oct 199474.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Portland in Oregon, USA

MicroData Summary for Paul Edward Waldschmidt:
Bishop Paul Edward Waldschmidt C.S.C. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Portland in Oregon

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013