Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Linus Paschang

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1895Born
12 Jun 192125.6Ordained PriestPriest of Omaha, Nebraska, USA
28 Jul 195155.8AppointedBishop of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA
9 Oct 195156.0Ordained BishopBishop of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA
11 Oct 195156.0InstalledBishop of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA
25 Jul 197276.8RetiredBishop of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA
21 Mar 1999103.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Grand Island, Nebraska, USA

MicroData Summary for John Linus Paschang
Bishop John Linus Paschang (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Grand Island

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHemingford

  • a priest for 77.7 years
  • a bishop for 47.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1951, Number 109
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2000, Page 1,233

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast