Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Michael Myles O’Gorman, O.C.S.O. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Nebraska, USA

Titular Bishop of Raphanea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1804Born
25 Mar 184136.4ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
23 Dec 184339.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
28 Jan 185954.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Nebraska, USA
28 Jan 185954.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Raphanea
8 May 185954.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Raphanea
4 Jul 187469.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Nebraska, USA

MicroData Summary for James Michael Myles O’Gorman
Bishop James Michael Myles O’Gorman O.C.S.O. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Nebraska

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCranna, Diocese of Killaloe, Ireland, Ireland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Saint Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri

  • a priest for 30.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 476
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1859, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Jan 2017