Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicholas Foran

Deceased

Bishop of Waterford and Lismore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1784¹BornButlerstown, Co. Waterford
1808¹24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
27 Apr 183147.3AppointedBishop of Galway, Ireland
6 Jun 183753.4AppointedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
24 Aug 183753.6Ordained BishopBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
11 May 185571.3DiedBishop of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Nicholas Foran (VIAF: 315635460)
Bishop Nicholas Foran (born 1784, died ) Bishop of Waterford and Lismore

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1842
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 400, and Page 201
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1837, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 5 Dec 2016