Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Patrick Joseph Carew

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western Bengal

Titular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1800¹BornWaterford, Ireland
6 Mar 183838.2AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Madras, India
6 Mar 183838.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
24 Jun 183838.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philadelphia in Arabia
4 Apr 184040.3SucceededVicar Apostolic of Madras, India
30 Nov 184040.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bengal, India
30 May 184343.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Edessa in OsrhoŽne
15 Feb 185050.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Western Bengal, India
2 Nov 185555.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Western Bengal, India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Joseph Carew:
Archbishop Patrick Joseph Carew (died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western Bengal

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,267
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 184, and Page 305

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013