Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste Boucho, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Malacca-Singapore

Titular Bishop of Attalea in Pamphylia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1797Born
1822¹24.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bordeaux, France
9 Aug 182326.3ProfessedPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
3 Jun 184548.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Malacca-Singapore
10 Jun 184548.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Attalea in Pamphylia
19 Oct 184548.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Attalea in Pamphylia
6 Mar 187173.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Malacca-Singapore

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Boucho
Bishop Jean-Baptiste Boucho M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Malacca-Singapore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAthos-Aspis, France

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 94
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1845, Number 45
  • bd: CB, 26 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast