Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cornelius Egan

Deceased

Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1780BornLismickfinan
26 May 180423.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 May 182443.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
11 May 182443.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Vera
25 Jul 182444.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vera
29 Sep 182444.2SucceededBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland
22 Jul 185676.0DiedBishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Cornelius Egan
Bishop Cornelius Egan (born , died ) Bishop of Kerry (o Ardfert) e Aghadoe

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,699
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 86, and Page 393
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 54
  • bp/bd/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 15 Aug 2016