Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Vincent Cleary

Deceased

Archbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1828Born
20 Sep 185123.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 188052.0AppointedBishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
21 Nov 188052.1Ordained BishopBishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
28 Dec 188961.2AppointedArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada
24 Feb 189869.4DiedArchbishop of Kingston, Ontario, Canada

MicroData Summary for James Vincent Cleary (VIAF: 56142320)
Archbishop James Vincent Cleary (born , died ) Archbishop of Kingston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDungarvan, Diocese of Waterford and Lismore, Ireland
Ordained BishopCollege de la Propaganda, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 479
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 May 2017