Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Joseph Carbery, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1823Born
1843²19.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
1846²22.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
4 Sep 188360.3AppointedBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
11 Nov 188360.5Ordained BishopBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
3 Apr 188460.9InstalledBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada
17 Dec 188764.6DiedBishop of Hamilton, Ontario, Canada

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Joseph Carbery
Bishop James Joseph Carbery O.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Hamilton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMullingar, Ireland
Ordained BishopSte Marie sopra Minerva, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1883, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 May 2017