Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry Damian Juncker

Deceased

Bishop of Alton, Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1809Born
16 Mar 183424.5Ordained PriestPriest of Cincinnati, Ohio, USA
9 Jan 185747.3AppointedBishop of Alton, Illinois, USA
26 Apr 185747.6Ordained BishopBishop of Alton, Illinois, USA
2 Oct 186859.1DiedBishop of Alton, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Henry Damian Juncker
Bishop Henry Damian Juncker (born , died ) Bishop of Alton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFénétrange, Diocese of Metz, France, France
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cincinnati, Archdiocese of Cincinnati, Ohio

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 91
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1857, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017