Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Melcher

Deceased

Bishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1806Born
27 Mar 183024.0Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
23 Jul 185347.3AppointedBishop of Quincy, Illinois, USA
3 Mar 186861.9AppointedBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
12 Jul 186862.3Ordained BishopBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA
20 Dec 187367.7DiedBishop of Green Bay, Wisconsin, USA

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Joseph Melcher
Bishop Joseph Melcher (born , died ) Bishop of Green Bay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVienna, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
Ordained PriestModena, Diocese of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
Ordained BishopSt Louis, Archdiocese of Saint Louis, Missouri
Death PlaceGreen Bay, Diocese of Green Bay, Wisconsin

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 520
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Mar 2017