Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adeodato Caleffi, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Modena (e Nonantola)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1761BornCarpi
21 May 178523.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
2 Oct 182665.2AppointedBishop of Carpi, Italy
26 Nov 182665.4Ordained BishopBishop of Carpi, Italy
5 Jul 183069.0AppointedBishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
5 Aug 183776.1DiedBishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy

MicroData Summary for Adeodato Caleffi:
Bishop Adeodato Caleffi O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Modena (e Nonantola)

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,208
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 135, and Page 273

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013