Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Emilio Sommariva

Deceased

Bishop of Modena (e Nonantola)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1761BornLodi
17 Dec 178524.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jul 182462.9AppointedBishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
18 Jul 182462.9Ordained BishopBishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy
7 Mar 182967.6DiedBishop of Modena (e Nonantola), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Emilio Sommariva
Bishop Giuseppe Emilio Sommariva (born , died ) Bishop of Modena (e Nonantola)

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 273
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1824, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 14 Jun 2016