Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Jataí

Dioecesis Iataiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 26 March 1956
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Goiânia
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Goias
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 62,978 (24,325 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Centro-Oeste
  • Mailing Address: Curia Diocesana, C.P. 02, Av. Joaquim Candido de Carvalho 56, 75800-000 Jatai, GO, Brazil
  • Telephone: (064)3631-1820
  • Fax: 3631-2423

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Jataí
21 June 1929ErectedTerritorial Prelature of Jataí (erected)
Diocese of Jataí
26 March 1956ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Jataí Diocese of Jataí
25 November 1961Territory LostArchdiocese of Goiânia
Diocese of Goiás
Diocese of Jataí
Territorial Prelature of São Luís de Montes Belos (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Jataí
1950130,0006621,66684ap1951
Diocese of Jataí
1966200,000247,87980.7%518238,695244913ap1967
1970250,000300,00083.3%823318,0641286715ap1971
1976320,000390,00082.1%3252811,4282325215ap1977
1980363,000420,00086.4%4222613,9611265315ap1981
1990323,000341,00094.7%7182512,9209197823ap1991
1999400,000500,00080.0%19123112,90319124827ap2000
2000400,000500,00080.0%20113112,90319115327ap2001
2001420,000520,00080.8%17133014,00021135327ap2002
2002429,000530,00080.9%17112815,32120115627ap2003
2003430,000530,00081.1%19123113,87019125827ap2004
2004430,000530,00081.1%17122914,82718125427ap2005
2006441,000543,00081.2%24133711,91817135228ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 15 Dec 2011