Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Germán Vega Campón, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Jataí

Titular Bishop of Oreus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Oct 1878BornAmusco, Spain
20 Dec 190224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
19 Apr 194162.5AppointedPrelate of Jataí, Brazil
19 Apr 194162.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Oreus
1 Jun 194162.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Oreus
8 May 195576.6RetiredPrelate of Jataí, Brazil
13 May 196182.6DiedPrelate Emeritus of Jataí, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Germán Vega Campón:
Bishop Germán Vega Campón O.S.A. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Jataí

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013