Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Pedro Mundo

Deceased

Bishop of Jataí, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1937Born
19 May 196224.8Ordained PriestPriest of Camden, New Jersey, USA
6 Mar 197840.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Jataí, Goias, Brazil
6 Mar 197840.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Blanda Julia
2 Jun 197840.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Blanda Julia
24 Feb 199961.5AppointedBishop of Jataí, Goias, Brazil
18 May 199961.8DiedBishop of Jataí, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Miguel Pedro Mundo
Bishop Miguel Pedro Mundo (born , died ) Bishop of Jataí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceStaten Island, NY, USA
Ordained BishopSte. Rose de Lima, Haddox Heights, Diocese of Camden, New Jersey, USA

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 47, Number 3,255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast