Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Louis Schad

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Camden, New Jersey, USA

Titular Bishop of Panatoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1917Born
10 Apr 194325.7Ordained PriestPriest of Camden, New Jersey, USA
18 Oct 196649.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Camden, New Jersey, USA
18 Oct 196649.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Panatoria
8 Dec 196649.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Panatoria
26 Jan 199375.5RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Camden, New Jersey, USA
27 Mar 200284.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Camden, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for James Louis Schad
Bishop James Louis Schad (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Camden

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia, PA, Archdiocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Ordained PriestCamden, NJ, Diocese of Camden, New Jersey

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 35.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast