Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pius Anthony Benincasa

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Buffalo, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Buruni


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1913Born
27 Mar 193723.7Ordained PriestPriest of Buffalo, New York, USA
8 May 196450.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
8 May 196450.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Buruni
29 Jun 196450.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buruni
13 Aug 198673.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Buffalo, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Pius Anthony Benincasa
Bishop Pius Anthony Benincasa (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Buffalo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNiagara Falls
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB, 11 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast