Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Johnston Navagh

Deceased

Bishop of Paterson, New Jersey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1901BornBuffalo
21 Dec 192928.7Ordained PriestPriest of Buffalo, New York, USA
29 Jul 195251.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Raleigh, North Carolina, USA
29 Jul 195251.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Ombi
24 Sep 195251.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ombi
2 May 195756.0AppointedBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
12 Feb 196361.8AppointedBishop of Paterson, New Jersey, USA
2 Oct 196564.4DiedBishop of Paterson, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for James Johnston Navagh:
Bishop James Johnston Navagh (born , died ) Bishop of Paterson

  • a priest for 35.7 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 84

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015