Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Aloysius McNulty

Deceased

Bishop of Buffalo, New York


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jan 1900BornNew York
12 Jul 192525.4Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
2 Aug 194747.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
2 Aug 194747.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Methone
7 Oct 194747.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Methone
9 Apr 195353.2AppointedBishop of Paterson, New Jersey, USA
12 Feb 196363.0AppointedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
4 Sep 197272.6DiedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for James Aloysius McNulty:
Bishop James Aloysius McNulty (born , died ) Bishop of Buffalo

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1947, Number 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015