Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edward Michael Grosz

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Buffalo, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Morosbisdus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1945 Born
29 May 197126.2Ordained PriestPriest of Buffalo, New York, USA
22 Nov 198944.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
22 Nov 198944.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Morosbisdus
2 Feb 199044.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Morosbisdus
2 Mar 202075.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Buffalo, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Edward Michael Grosz
Bishop Edward Michael Grosz (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Buffalo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuffalo, Diocese of Buffalo, New York
Ordained BishopSaint Joseph, Cathedral, Buffalo, Diocese of Buffalo, New York

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Buffalo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,691
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast