Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Henry Guilfoyle

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Camden, New Jersey, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1913Born
25 Mar 194430.3Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
17 Oct 196450.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
17 Oct 196450.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Marazanae
30 Nov 196451.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marazanae
2 Jan 196854.1AppointedBishop of Camden, New Jersey, USA
4 Mar 196854.3InstalledBishop of Camden, New Jersey, USA
13 May 198975.5RetiredBishop of Camden, New Jersey, USA
11 Jun 199177.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Camden, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for George Henry Guilfoyle
Bishop George Henry Guilfoyle (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Camden

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, NY

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018