Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvério Jarbas Paulo de Albuquerque, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Feira de Santana, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1917Born
30 May 194225.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
17 Mar 197053.0AppointedBishop of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil
10 May 197053.1Ordained BishopBishop of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil
18 Jan 197355.8AppointedBishop of Feira de Santana, Bahia, Brazil
22 Feb 199577.9RetiredBishop of Feira de Santana, Bahia, Brazil
28 May 201396.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Feira de Santana, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Silvério Jarbas Paulo de Albuquerque
Bishop Silvério Jarbas Paulo de Albuquerque O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Feira de Santana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlinda, Archdiocese of Olinda
Ordained BishopFranciscan, Church, São Salvador, Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia

  • a priest for 70.9 years
  • a bishop for 43.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 28 May 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 10, Number 503

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast