Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Edson Santana de Oliveira

Bishop of Eunápolis, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1952 Born
18 Jan 197825.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jun 199643.6AppointedBishop of Eunápolis, Bahia, Brazil
8 Sep 199643.8Ordained BishopBishop of Eunápolis, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Edson Santana de Oliveira
Bishop José Edson Santana de Oliveira (born ) Bishop of Eunápolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDuas Serras

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Eunápolis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,846

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018