Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Paulo Afonso

Dioecesis Paulalfonsanensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Guido Zendron, Bishop

General Information


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
14 September 1971ErectedDiocese of Bonfim Diocese of Paulo Afonso (erected)
16 January 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Paulo Afonso (from Sao Salvador da Bahia)
21 September 2005Territory LostArchdiocese of Feira de Santana
Diocese of Paulo Afonso
Diocese of Serrinha (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1974368,440369,44099.7%941328,3415503511ap1981
1976368,437369,43799.7%941328,3415503511ap1977
1990543,000598,00090.8%15112620,884115918ap1991
1999488,250561,96286.9%2362916,83666026ap2000
2000488,300561,96286.9%2152618,78055026ap2001
2001488,500601,21581.3%2272916,844154426ap2002
2002488,600601,21581.3%2452916,84855526ap2003
2003488,698601,21581.3%2753215,27155026ap2004
2004488,698601,21581.3%2452916,85154726ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.7.9, 28 May 2012; data: 20 Jun 2012