Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jackson Berenguer Prado

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Paulo Afonso, Baia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1918BornTucano
13 Jun 194325.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Apr 195839.9AppointedBishop of Vitória da Conquista, Baia, Brazil
3 Aug 195840.2Ordained BishopBishop of Vitória da Conquista, Baia, Brazil
24 Sep 196244.4AppointedBishop of Feira de Santana, Baia, Brazil
8 Oct 197153.4AppointedBishop of Paulo Afonso, Baia, Brazil
17 Aug 198365.3ResignedBishop of Paulo Afonso, Baia, Brazil
8 Feb 200586.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Paulo Afonso, Baia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jackson Berenguer Prado:
Bishop Jackson Berenguer Prado (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Paulo Afonso

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 46.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013