Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aloysio José Leal Penna, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Botucatu, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1933BornPiquete
21 Dec 196330.8Ordained PriestPriest
15 Aug 196633.5ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
21 May 198451.2AppointedBishop of Paulo Afonso, Bahia, Brazil
22 Jul 198451.4Ordained BishopBishop of Paulo Afonso, Bahia, Brazil
30 Oct 198754.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bauru, Sao Paulo, Brazil
4 Sep 199057.5SucceededBishop of Bauru, Sao Paulo, Brazil
7 Jun 200067.3AppointedArchbishop of Botucatu, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Nov 200875.7RetiredArchbishop of Botucatu, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Jun 201279.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Botucatu, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Aloysio José Leal Penna:
Archbishop Aloysio José Leal Penna S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Botucatu

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Nov 2008
  • d: CB, 19 Jun 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015