Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sérgio Krzywy

Bishop of Araçatuba, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1952 BornPalmeira
28 Dec 198331.4Ordained PriestPriest of Assis, Sao Paulo, Brazil
26 May 200451.9AppointedBishop of Araçatuba, Sao Paulo, Brazil
14 Aug 200452.1Ordained BishopBishop of Araçatuba, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Sérgio Krzywy:
Bishop Sérgio Krzywy (born ) Bishop of Araçatuba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Araçatuba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,671

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 22 Apr 2015