Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulo Roberto Beloto

Bishop of Franca, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1957 Born
29 Jun 198629.2Ordained PriestPriest of Marília, Sao Paulo, Brazil
16 Nov 200548.6AppointedBishop of Formosa, Goias, Brazil
4 Feb 200648.8Ordained BishopBishop of Formosa, Goias, Brazil
18 Feb 200648.8InstalledBishop of Formosa, Goias, Brazil
23 Oct 201356.5AppointedBishop of Franca, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Paulo Roberto Beloto
Bishop Paulo Roberto Beloto (born ) Bishop of Franca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAdamantina

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Franca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Nov 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,052
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Oct 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018