Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Casimiro Wilk, O.F.M. Conv.

Bishop of Anápolis, Goias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1951 BornSeroczyn, Poland
24 Jun 197624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
28 Jan 199846.3AppointedBishop of Formosa, Goias, Brazil
4 Apr 199846.5Ordained BishopBishop of Formosa, Goias, Brazil
9 Jun 200452.7AppointedBishop of Anápolis, Goias, Brazil
14 Aug 200452.9InstalledBishop of Anápolis, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Casimiro Wilk:
Bishop João Casimiro Wilk O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Bishop of Anápolis

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Anápolis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,263

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015