Catholic-Hierarchy DC

José Cardinal Freire Falcão

Archbishop Emeritus of Brasília, Distrito Federal

Cardinal-Priest of San Luca a Via Prenestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1925 BornEreré
19 Jun 194923.7Ordained PriestPriest of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil
24 Apr 196741.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil
24 Apr 196741.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Vardimissa
17 Jun 196741.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vardimissa
19 Aug 196741.8SucceededBishop of Limoeiro do Norte, Ceara, Brazil
25 Nov 197146.1AppointedArchbishop of Teresina, Piaui, Brazil
15 Feb 198458.3AppointedArchbishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil
28 Jun 198862.7Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 198862.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Luca a Via Prenestina
28 Jan 200478.3RetiredArchbishop of Brasília, Distrito Federal, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Freire Falcão:
José Cardinal Freire Falcão (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Brasília

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Brasília.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 13 Nov 2014