Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente de Paulo Araújo Matos

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Crato, Ceara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1918BornItapagé
29 Nov 194224.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 195536.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Crato, Ceara, Brazil
21 Apr 195536.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Antiochia ad Maeandrum
11 Jun 195537.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Antiochia ad Maeandrum
28 Jan 196142.6AppointedBishop of Crato, Ceara, Brazil
1 Jun 199273.9RetiredBishop of Crato, Ceara, Brazil
6 Dec 199880.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Crato, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Vicente de Paulo Araújo Matos:
Bishop Vicente de Paulo Araújo Matos (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Crato

  • a priest for 56.0 years
  • a bishop for 43.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015