Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco de Assis Pires

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Crato, Ceara

Titular Archbishop of Antiochia in Pisidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1880BornSalvador
14 Apr 190322.5Ordained PriestPriest
11 Aug 193150.9AppointedBishop of Crato, Ceara, Brazil
6 Dec 193151.2Ordained BishopBishop of Crato, Ceara, Brazil
11 Jul 195978.8RetiredBishop of Crato, Ceara, Brazil
11 Jul 195978.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Antiochia in Pisidia
10 Feb 196079.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Crato, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Assis Pires:
Archbishop Francisco de Assis Pires (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Crato

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 69

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013